THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 10:01:07 AM
Urbantke, Elizabeth Andrea
CPSO#:
71016
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Jun 1997
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jun 1997
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
303-235 North Centre Rd
London ON N5X 4E7
Phone: 519-661-6624
Fax: 519-661-6617
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Woodstock Hospital |
Woodstock |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:06 Jun 1997 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:01 Dec 1998 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ELIZABETH ANDREA URBANTKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. URBANTKE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 17 Mar 1997 to 30 Mar 1997
EL - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Mar 1997 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Mar 1997 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 1997 |