THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 20:22:16 PM
Gholam, Bassam Ibrahim Ahmad
CPSO#:
70992
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Feb 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Feb 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: King Faisal University, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
5546 Portage Rd
Greater Niagara General Hospital
Niagara Falls ON L2E 6X2
Phone: 905 378 4647
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
New Brunswick
Saudi Arabia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site |
Fort Erie |
Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site |
Port Colborne |
Niagara Health System - Welland Site |
Welland |
Niagara Health System |
Niagara Falls |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:16 Dec 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:11 Oct 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BASSAM IBRAHIM AHMAD GHOLAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHOLAM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 28 Feb 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Mar 1998 to 28 Feb 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Mar 1999 to 29 Feb 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Mar 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
CF - Trauma General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - Emergency Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Trauma General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Trauma General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Feb 1997 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 16 Feb 2006 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Jul 2006 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Jul 2006 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Dec 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Apr 2008 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Sep 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Oct 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 12 Feb 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Feb 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Feb 2011 |