THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
07/05/24 3:07:11 AM
Ruijs, Theodora Catharina Geziena
CPSO#:
70963
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Jun 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Jun 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Dutch, English
Education: State University of Utrecht, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Laboratory Medicine
Brampton Civic Hospital
William Osler Health System
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Ext. 58719
Fax: (905) 494-6622
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Headwaters Health Care Centre |
Orangeville |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Pathology |
Effective:02 Jun 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. THEODORA CATHARINA GEZIENA RUIJS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUIJS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
CF - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
CF - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 14 Jan 1999
CF - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jan 1997 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Jan 1999 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 26 Jan 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Jun 1999 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 1999 |