THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 16:43:06 PM
You, John Myeung-Sae
CPSO#:
70936
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Aug 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Aug 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 10
78 Corporate Drive
Scarborough ON M1H 3G4
Phone: (416) 279-0855 Ext. 235
Fax: 647-362-4554
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Health Network |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:22 Jun 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Vascular Surgery |
Effective:10 Sep 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOHN MYEUNG-SAE YOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
Resident 6 - Vascular Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 7 - Vascular Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 1997 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1998 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Aug 1999 |