THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 21:21:08 PM
Norris, Mireille Amelie
CPSO#:
70932
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jan 1997
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Jan 1998
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médeci, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Women's College Centre
Unit HG39
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 4076
Fax: (416) 480-4778
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:31 Dec 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Geriatric Medicine |
Effective:17 Sep 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MIREILLE AMELIE NORRIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NORRIS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Geriatric Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
Resident 4 - Geriatric Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Geriatric Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 14 Feb 1999
Resident 5 - Geriatric Medicine
University of Toronto, 15 Feb 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
CF - Geriatric Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 13 Feb 2000
CF - Geriatric Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 1997 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jan 1998 |