THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 23:17:33 PM
Wallace, Eda Jacqueline
CPSO#:
70911
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
31 Aug 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Aug 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of the West Indies, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Medical Imaging
Grand River Hospital
P O Box 9056
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300 Ext. 5912
Fax: (519) 749-4296
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
St Mary's General Hospital |
Kitchener |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:09 May 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. EDA JACQUELINE WALLACE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALLACE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Mar 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 18 Oct 2004
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Nov 1996 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 May 1998 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Oct 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 26 Oct 2004 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Aug 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Aug 2006 |