THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 18:00:35 PM
Lesk, Mark Richard
CPSO#:
70910
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Oct 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Oct 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Ophtalmology
Maisonneuve - Rosemount Hospital
5415 boul Assomption
Montreal QC H1T 2M4
Phone: (514) 252-3400 Ext. 4959
Fax: (514) 252-3905
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:27 Nov 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARK RICHARD LESK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LESK is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Nov 1996 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 14 Aug 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Oct 2009 |