THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 5:34:47 AM
Somogyi, Dan Mitchell
CPSO#:
70829
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Sep 1996
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Sep 1996
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McMaster University, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
345-4750 Yonge St
North York ON M2N 0J6
Phone: 416-665-1881
Fax: 905-731-1290
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation |
Effective:06 Jun 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAN MITCHELL SOMOGYI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOMOGYI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Sep 1996 |