THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 9:04:23 AM
Sabouba, Mohammad Fayez
CPSO#:
70814
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Aug 1996
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Jul 1998
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Mosul, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
609 Upper James Street
Hamilton ON L9C 2Y9
Phone: (905) 575-7230
Fax: (905) 575-7191
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD FAYEZ SABOUBA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SABOUBA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1997 to 12 Aug 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 13 Aug 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Aug 1996 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jul 1998 |