THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 14:22:16 PM
Tolton, Rani Gurinderjitpal
CPSO#:
70796
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Jun 1997
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Jun 1997
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
820-800 Burrard St
Vancouver BC V6Z 2J8
Phone: 604-666-5602
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brockville General Hospital |
Brockville |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:05 Jun 1997 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RANI GURINDERJITPAL TOLTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOLTON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 29 Aug 1996 to 25 Sep 1996
EL - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 11 Jan 2016 to 01 Apr 2016
CF - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 29 Aug 1996 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 25 Sep 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 1997 |