THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 0:46:59 AM
Mahmood, Naseeruddin
CPSO#:
70794
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Nov 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
15 Nov 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: Aga Khan University, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Kennedy Medical Clinic
7990 Kennedy Road South
Brampton ON L6W 0B3
Phone: 905-455-5445
Fax: 905-455-5665
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: N. Mahmood Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 13 2022
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Pakistan
USA - California
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:15 Nov 2016 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Aug 1996 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1998 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Nov 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Apr 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Aug 2018 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Aug 2018 |
|
Active |