THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 6:23:33 AM
Aboulisayen, Abdullah Mohamed
CPSO#:
70791
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Sep 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Sep 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicin, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 357
1720 Howard Avenue East
Windsor ON N8X 5A6
Phone: (519) 258-4900
Fax: (519) 258-4901
Electoral District: 01
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Windsor Regional Hospital |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:24 Jun 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ABDULLAH MOHAMED ABOULISAYEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABOULISAYEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jun 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Aug 1996 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Sep 2008 |