THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 1:21:58 AM
Malik, Paul Guneet
CPSO#:
70790
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Jun 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Jun 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Calgary, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Cardiovascular Lab, Kidd 3
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-1329
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:13 Sep 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PAUL GUNEET MALIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALIK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 26 Aug 1996 to 22 Sep 1996
EL - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jun 1999 to 31 Jul 1999
EL - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Aug 1996 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Sep 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 1999 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 2001 |