THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 19:28:02 PM
Kallmeyer, Jeffrey Lynton
CPSO#:
70753
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
15 Aug 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
02 Nov 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Jeffrey L. Kallmeyer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 5 2011
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Australia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:15 Nov 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 1996 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 02 Nov 2015 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 02 Nov 2015 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 15 Aug 2019 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: November 2, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the voluntary cease-to-practise Undertaking given by Dr. Jeffrey Lynton Kallmeyer to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective November 2, 2015:
Dr. Kallmeyer has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in Ontario and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.