THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 6:11:19 AM
Kornecki, Aleksander
CPSO#:
70735
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of
23 Apr 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
25 Mar 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hebrew, Italian
Education: Universita di Milano, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Kornecki Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 22 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:28 Oct 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
CF - Paediatric Critical Care
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
CF - Paediatric Critical Care
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jul 1996 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1998 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 25 Mar 2004 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Sep 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Mar 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Apr 2018 |