THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 0:41:33 AM
Quackenbush, Susie Jean
CPSO#:
70724
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Aug 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Aug 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Susie Quackenbush Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 9 2024
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Almonte General Hospital |
Almonte |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:18 Jul 2003 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SUSIE JEAN QUACKENBUSH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QUACKENBUSH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 May 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jun 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 01 Jan 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 02 Jan 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 29 Jul 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 1996 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Jul 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Aug 2003 |