THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 12:50:35 PM
Kulkarni, Ramesh
CPSO#:
70716
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Aug 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Aug 1998
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Kannada, Marathi, Tamil
Education: Mysore University, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North Bay Regional Health Centre |
North Bay |
Temiskaming Hospital |
New Liskeard |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:07 Jun 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RAMESH KULKARNI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KULKARNI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 17 Sep 1996
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 18 Sep 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 23 Jul 1997
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jul 1996 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Jul 1997 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Aug 1998 |