THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 23:38:13 PM
Gzik, Diana Julia
CPSO#:
70710
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Jul 1996
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jul 1996
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Gzik, Danusia Julia (used until: 01 Nov 2017 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
131 Howland Drive
Huntsville ON P1H 2P7
Phone: (705) 789-6137
Fax: 855-933-2717
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital |
Huntsville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:28 Jun 1996 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DIANA JULIA GZIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GZIK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
CF - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jul 1996 |