THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 5:42:49 AM
Kachroo, Umang Bhat
CPSO#:
70706
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Oct 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Oct 1998
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi
Education: Kashmir University, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Albion Finch Medical Centre
Suite 106
1620 Albion Road
Toronto ON M9V 4B4
Phone: (416) 741-1500
Fax: (416) 741-1506
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:11 Jun 1998 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. UMANG BHAT KACHROO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KACHROO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jul 1996 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1998 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Oct 1998 |