THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 19:43:55 PM
Pratt, Kathleen Joyce
CPSO#:
70665
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
09 Aug 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
04 Mar 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Calgary, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Pratt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 29 2019
Corporation Name: Pratt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 11 2022
Hospital Privileges
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: May 22, 2013
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On June 14, 2013, Bluewater Health notified the College that Dr. Pratt's privileges were restricted, effective May 22, 2013.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:03 Nov 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Colorectal Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
CF - Colorectal Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 1996 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Apr 1997 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee |
Effective: 04 Oct 2013 |
Suspension of registration removed |
Effective: 04 Jan 2014 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 Mar 2016 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Mar 2016 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 09 Aug 2023 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 03 Oct 2013
Summary:
On October 3, 2013, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Kathleen Joyce Pratt committed an act of professional misconduct, in that she engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. Dr. Pratt admitted the allegation.
Dr. Pratt submitted swabs from herself for testing for Methicillin Resistant Staphylococcus Aureus ("MRSA") and disguised them under the name and identity of an employee without the knowledge and/or consent of that individual. After learning she was MRSA positive, she treated herself for the MRSA and returned to her regular duties as a surgeon at the hospital without seeking medical care from any other physician and without confirming she was no longer colonized with MRSA. She failed to take reasonable steps to ensure the accuracy of the health record of the staff member under whose name she had submitted for testing.
In addition to antibiotics for MRSA, Dr. Pratt repeatedly prescribed other medication for herself between 2006 and 2012.
Dr. Pratt has taken a boundaries and recordkeeping course, as well as attended educational sessions relevant to surgical site infections and ethics.
The Committee ordered and directed that:
( the Registrar suspend Dr. Pratt's certificate of registration for a period of three (3) months commencing 12:01 a.m. October 4, 2013.
( Dr. Pratt appear before the panel to be reprimanded.
( Dr. Pratt pay to the College costs in the amount of $4,460 within 60 days of the Order.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): October 3, 2013
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: March 4, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Kathleen Joyce Pratt to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 4, 2016:
Dr. Pratt was the subject of a College investigation into whether she meets the standard of care and/or is incompetent in her general surgical practice. As a result of the investigation, Dr. Pratt may only practise as a surgical assistant under the direction of a surgeon who is acceptable to the College, or provide minor office-based procedures under local anesthesia including any necessary consultations and prescriptions related to those minor procedures.