THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
07/05/24 14:31:48 PM
Moller, Henry Joachim
CPSO#:
70658
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
03 Jun 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Jun 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
3-Jun-2020
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, German
Education: University of Toronto, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Henry Moller Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 22 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 1996 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2001 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee |
Effective: 29 Apr 2020 |
Suspension of registration removed |
Effective: 01 Jun 2020 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 03 Jun 2020 |
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: January 15, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Note: This matter was confirmed by HPARB and Dr. Moller has now commenced an application for judicial review of this decision by the Divisional Court, Ontario.
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.
Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)