THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 0:55:52 AM
Tumi, Kamaleddin
CPSO#:
70642
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Aug 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Aug 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicin, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
222 Mapleview Dr W
Barrie ON L4N 9E7
Phone: 705 737 9235
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre |
Barrie |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KAMALEDDIN TUMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TUMI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
CF - Plastic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 1996 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Sep 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Aug 2004 |