THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 19:39:06 PM
Shah, Vibhuti Shantilal
CPSO#:
70622
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Jul 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Jul 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati, Hindi, Marathi
Education: Seth G. S. Medical College, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Paediatrics
Mount Sinai Hospital
Room 19-231N
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4816
Fax: (416) 586-8745
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:10 May 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. VIBHUTI SHANTILAL SHAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAH is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jul 1996 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 04 Jun 1998 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 Jun 1998 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1999 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 17 Jan 2001 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 May 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Jul 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jul 2005 |