THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 19:27:34 PM
Leon, Sebastian Bosco
CPSO#:
70604
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Dec 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Mar 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
CFB Trenton
P O Box 1000 Station Forces
Suite 190
95 RCAF Road
Astra ON K0K 3W0
Phone: (613) 955-8714
Fax: (613) 955-8656
Electoral District: 06
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:11 Jun 1996 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SEBASTIAN BOSCO LEON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEON is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 1996 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 20 Dec 2020 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Mar 2021 |
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: July 25, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective May 29, 2019, Dr. Leon has completed all elements of this SCERP.
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)