THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 14:17:27 PM
Lapner, Peter
CPSO#:
70602
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Jul 1996
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Toronto, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
Box 502, W 1648
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8377
Fax: (613) 737-8837
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital |
Hawkesbury |
Kemptville District Hospital |
Kemptville |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PETER LAPNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAPNER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 23 Sep 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 24 Sep 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 15 Dec 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 16 Dec 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 20 Jun 2002
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 1996 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2001 |