THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 18:51:11 PM
Mantle, Ross Edward
CPSO#:
70579
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
16 Jan 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
25 Feb 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Ross Mantle Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 16 2023
Medical Records Location
Date Received: 09 Nov 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurosurgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1996 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Aug 2005 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 25 Feb 2021 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Jun 2022 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 16 Jan 2023 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: January 16, 2023
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Ross Edward Mantle to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective January 16, 2023
College investigations were conducted into whether Dr. Mantle, in his conduct and neurosurgery practice, has engaged in professional misconduct or is incompetent. In the face of these investigations, Dr. Mantle resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)
Source:
Member
Active Date: February 25, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Ross Edward Mantle to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 25, 2021:
A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Mantle engaged in professional misconduct and/or was incompetent in his performance and reporting of electromyography studies and nerve conduction studies. As a result of the investigation, Dr. Mantle has ceased to perform electromyography studies and nerve conduction studies.