THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 1:54:17 AM
MacIsaac, Michael Gerard
CPSO#:
70549
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1996
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Jul 1996
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
stratford general hospital
dept of emergency medicine
Stratford ON N5A 2Y6
Phone: (519) 272-8210 Ext. 2455
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Stratford General Hospital |
Stratford |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:19 Jun 1996 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:05 Dec 1997 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHAEL GERARD MACISAAC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACISAAC is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1996 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 1996 |