THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 6:43:00 AM
Lanius, Ruth Anne
CPSO#:
70520
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1996
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, German
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
P O Box 5339
London ON N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3306
Fax: (519) 663-3927
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
St Joseph Health Care London - Mental Health |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RUTH ANNE LANIUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANIUS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neuropathology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1996 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2000 |