THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 18:48:12 PM
Douglas, Elizabeth Anne
CPSO#:
70512
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 May 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 May 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Calgary, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Meadows LTC
12 Tranquility Ave
Ancaster ON L9G 5C2
Phone: (905) 304-1993
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:11 Jun 1997 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ELIZABETH ANNE DOUGLAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOUGLAS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 28 Jul 1996
EL - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 19 Aug 1996 to 22 Sep 1996
EL - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1996 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Jul 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 Aug 1996 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Sep 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 May 2000 |