THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 4:51:13 AM
Young, Beverly
CPSO#:
70496
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Sep 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Sep 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1-100 King St W
Better BRIA Inc.
Toronto ON M5X 1A0
Phone: 416-646-2742
Fax: 416-646-2741
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:15 Sep 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BEVERLY YOUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUNG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 09 Sep 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 10 Sep 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 14 Sep 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1996 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Sep 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Sep 2001 |