THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 10:20:57 AM
Robichaud, Jeff Marcel
CPSO#:
70445
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Oct 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Oct 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 5
23 Hannover Drive
St Catharines ON L2W 1A3
Phone: (905) 685-0267
Fax: (905) 685-0265
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System - Welland Site |
Welland |
Niagara Health System |
Niagara Falls |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery |
Effective:30 Sep 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JEFF MARCEL ROBICHAUD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBICHAUD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Nov 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Dec 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Sep 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1996 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2001 |