THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 18:28:14 PM
McLean, Laurie Elizabeth
CPSO#:
70437
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1996
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 215
1385 Bank Street
Ottawa ON K1H 8N4
Phone: (613) 562-9000
Fax: (613) 562-9898
Electoral District: 07
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Laurie McLean Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 13 2021
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nunavut
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site |
Ottawa |
Renfrew Victoria Hospital |
Renfrew |
Winchester District Memorial Hospital |
Winchester |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LAURIE ELIZABETH MCLEAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCLEAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1996 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2001 |