THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 5:23:34 AM
Yang, Heather Christine
CPSO#:
70431
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1996
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6625
Fax: (416) 530-6294
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: H.C. Yang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 15 2022
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HEATHER CHRISTINE YANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YANG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1996 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2000 |