THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 9:16:39 AM
McLauchlin, Michelle Susanne
CPSO#:
70420
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
19 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
25 Apr 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
19-Jun-2019
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Michelle McLauchlin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 1 2012
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Clinical Immunology and Allergy |
Effective:08 Sep 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1996 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2000 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 11 Aug 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Aug 2007 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 25 Apr 2016 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 25 Apr 2016 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 19 Jun 2019 |
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: May 4, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)