THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 1:45:20 AM
Gupta, Sanjay Kumar
CPSO#:
70412
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Jun 1996
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Jun 1996
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
5055 Plantation Place
Buliding C
Mississauga ON L5M 6J3
Phone: 905-279-1144
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre |
Toronto |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:19 Jun 1996 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:01 Dec 1999 |
CFPC Specialist |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:26 Aug 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SANJAY KUMAR GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
University of Toronto, 27 Aug 2007 to 26 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 27 Aug 2008 to 26 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 27 Aug 2009 to 26 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 27 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jun 1996 |