THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 18:16:21 PM
Richardson, David Campbell
CPSO#:
70399
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1996
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Aug 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2100 Bovaird Dr E
William Osler Health System Brampto
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Phone: 905-494-2120 Ext. 57658
Fax: 905-494-6506
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Infectious Diseases |
Effective:12 Sep 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Microbiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAVID CAMPBELL RICHARDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICHARDSON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Microbiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Microbiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1996 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Aug 2000 |