THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 17:18:52 PM
Morrin, Sharon Mary Landry
CPSO#:
70388
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1996
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Feb 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Landry, Sharon Mary (used until: 21 Apr 1998 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-4842
Fax: (613) 721-4785
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Queensway Carleton Hospital |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Sep 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematology |
Effective:20 Sep 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHARON MARY LANDRY MORRIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORRIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 29 Feb 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Mar 2000 to 28 Feb 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology
University of Ottawa, 01 Mar 2001 to 28 Feb 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology
University of Ottawa, 01 Mar 2002 to 31 Aug 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1996 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Feb 2002 |