THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 13:37:34 PM
Jankov, Robert Peter
CPSO#:
70378
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 May 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
05 May 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Melbourne Faculty of Medic, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
C H E O
Division of Neonatology
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 4029
Fax: (613) 738-4847
Electoral District: 07
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: R. P. Jankov Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 18 2024
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Australia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine |
Effective:13 Oct 2022 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Pediatrics |
Effective:13 Oct 2022 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1996 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 04 Jun 1998 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 Jun 1998 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1999 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2003 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Sep 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Dec 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Aug 2009 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 07 Aug 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Mar 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 May 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Jan 2020 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Oct 2022 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Oct 2022 |
|
Active |