THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 13:23:41 PM
Mamelak, Joshua David
CPSO#:
70373
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Apr 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Apr 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health Centre
Etobicoke General Site
Department of Radiology
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON M9V 1R8
Phone: (416) 747-3400 Ext. 32528
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: J. Mamelak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 19 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:01 Jun 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOSHUA DAVID MAMELAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAMELAK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1996 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1998 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 04 Aug 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Apr 2005 |