THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 14:11:13 PM
Malhotra, Kenneth Samuel
CPSO#:
70370
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1996
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Jun 1998
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Digestive Health Clinic Inc
1031 Brock Road
Pickering ON L1W 3T7
Phone: (905) 683-1700
Fax: (905) 683-2577
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sault Area Hospital |
Sault Ste. Marie |
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:11 Jun 1998 |
CFPC Specialist |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:21 Sep 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:09 Oct 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KENNETH SAMUEL MALHOTRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALHOTRA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1996 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1998 |