THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 18:37:41 PM
Kang, Amrit Kaur
CPSO#:
70356
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1996
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Oct 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: University of Toronto, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Sunnyside Building
West Wing, Suite 332
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6227
Fax: 437-317-9777
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nephrology |
Effective:12 Sep 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AMRIT KAUR KANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KANG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1996 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Oct 2000 |