THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 0:17:59 AM
Buconjic, Tomislav
CPSO#:
70318
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Jan 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Jan 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 36016
3090 Colonel Talbot Road
London ON N6P 0B0
Phone: 647-345-7302
Electoral District: 02
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Buconjic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 2 2010
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TOMISLAV BUCONJIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUCONJIC is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1996 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jan 2001 |