THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 0:37:52 AM
Hong, Aaron Pyung
CPSO#:
70313
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Nov 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Nov 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
710-700 Dorval Dr
Oakville ON L6K 3V3
Phone: 647 202-9228
Fax: 1 855 366-3228
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AARON PYUNG HONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HONG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1996 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Nov 2001 |