THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 19:30:25 PM
Gilbert, Sebastien
CPSO#:
70307
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Sep 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Sep 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Division of Thoracic Surgery
Suite 6363
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 7 4033
Fax: (613) 737-8668
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Thoracic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SEBASTIEN GILBERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILBERT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1996 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Sep 2009 |