THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 8:37:54 AM
Guimond, Marie-Claude
CPSO#:
70303
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1996
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Psychiatry
North York General Hospital
room 821
4001 Leslie St.
Toronto ON M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6676
Fax: (416) 756-6671
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARIE-CLAUDE GUIMOND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUIMOND is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1996 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2001 |