THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 0:54:43 AM
Peerbaye, Yousouf Ally
CPSO#:
70282
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Aug 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Jun 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Toronto, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Yousouf Peerbaye Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 12 2013
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1996 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2001 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Aug 2013 |