THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 13:24:21 PM
Martens, Chandra Gwyn Renee
CPSO#:
70281
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Jun 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jun 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Queen's University, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
210 - 1902 Robertson Road
Ottawa ON K2H 5B8
Phone: (613) 726-3558 Ext. 21
Fax: (613) 688-0315
Electoral District: 07
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: C. Martens Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 31 2019
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:15 Jul 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHANDRA GWYN RENEE MARTENS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTENS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 16 Dec 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 17 Dec 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 21 Sep 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 15 Jan 2002 to 14 Jan 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology
University of Ottawa, 15 Jan 2003 to 16 Feb 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 17 Mar 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 15 Jul 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1996 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Sep 1998 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 19 Oct 1998 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Jun 1999 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 1999 |