THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 16:29:49 PM
Moffat, Grant Stuart
CPSO#:
70275
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
25 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
14 Aug 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Bard Moffat Woolfson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 9 2017
Corporation Name: Grant Moffat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 6 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:2207 Dunwin Dr
Mississauga ON L5L 1X1
Date Received: 25 Jun 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1996 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Aug 2001 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 25 Jun 2019 |