THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 17:01:53 PM
Lessard, Serge
CPSO#:
70271
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Jul 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Jul 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McMaster University, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
3591 Innes Rd
Ottawa ON K1C 1T1
Phone: (613) 834 3444
Fax: (613) 824-5538
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:05 Jun 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SERGE LESSARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LESSARD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1996 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 Aug 2001 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Jul 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Jul 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 2003 |