THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 1:48:18 AM
Brade, Anthony Matthew
CPSO#:
70250
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1996
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Peel Regional Cancer Centre, Credit
Valley Hospital, Dept of Radiation
Oncology, 2200 Eglinton Ave West
Mississauga, ON, L5M 2N1
Toronto ON M5G 2M9
Phone: 905 813-1100 Ext. 4803
Fax: 905 813-3963
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:30 Jun 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANTHONY MATTHEW BRADE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRADE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1996 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2005 |